Mersereau, Guyon Paul Mead (CPSO#: 17836)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1961
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 May 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jun 2003