Mertens, Wilson Cyrille (CPSO#: 51192)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 May 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 08 Sep 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 May 2006