Merziotis, Maria (CPSO#: 105877)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CareMedics Manotick
2-1160 Beaverwood Road
Manotick ON  K4M 1L6
Phone: (613) 692-0244
Fax: (613) 692-0258
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA MERZIOTIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERZIOTIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 23 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2017