Mesaglio, Norman Roy (CPSO#: 20529)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 17 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Apr 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2005