Meschino, Diane Caron (CPSO#: 55686)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6400 Ext. 6230
Fax: (416) 323-6356
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANE CARON MESCHINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MESCHINO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 13 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1986