Meshkat, Nazanin (CPSO#: 73506)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Spanish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-3856
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nazanin Meshkat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Meshkat ( CPSO# 73506 )

Business Address:
University Health Network
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3856

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAZANIN MESHKAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MESHKAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2004