Messer, Vernon Robert (CPSO#: 12478)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Sep 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1947

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1947
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Apr 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1993

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 20 Nov 1991
Summary:

 In November 1991, Dr. Messer pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in 
 s. 27(26) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he made improper use of the authority 
 to prescribe, sell or dispense a drug, including falsifying a record in respect of a prescription 
 or the sale of a drug.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and found Dr. Messer guilty of 
 professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Messer be reprimanded, with 
 the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.  The Committee also ruled that Dr. 
 Messer's licence to practice be suspended for a period of three months, but that the final two 
 months of this suspension would themselves be suspended if the Doctor completed courses of 
 instruction, satisfactory to the Registrar, in the proper maintenance of medical records, and the 
 appropriate prescription of drugs to suspected drug abusers.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 20 Nov 1991


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 20 Feb 1991
Summary:

 In February 1991, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Messer guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the 
 standard of practice of the profession.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Messer be 
 reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.  The Committee further 
 ruled that Dr. Messer be required to attend the McMaster Physician Review and Evaluation Program 
 within three months of this Order becoming final, and that should the Doctor fail to achieve a 
 category 3 or better, his licence to practice would be suspended until such a standing was 
 achieved.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 22 Jan 1993
Hearing Date(s): 19 Feb 1991