Messervey, Elizabeth Anne (CPSO#: 58454)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Mar 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
555 George Street North
Peterborough ON  K9H 3S1
Phone: (705) 741-0311
Fax: (705) 741-5374
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Messervey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Messervey ( CPSO# 58454 )

Business Address:
555 George Street North
Peterborough ON  K9H 3S1
Phone Number: (705) 741-0311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANNE MESSERVEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MESSERVEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 1989