Messina, Sarina (CPSO#: 64175)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
1915 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2C 0C7
Phone: (613) 233-3976
Fax: 6136951996
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Messina Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Messina ( CPSO# 64175 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
1915 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2C 0C7
Phone Number: (613) 233-3976

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Nov 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARINA MESSINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MESSINA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Dec 2007 to 30 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Dec 2008 to 30 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1993