Metcalfe, Brian John (CPSO#: 21783)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice

Medical Records Location

Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre, 1 Hospital Drive, Peterborough, ON K9J 7C6
Date Received: 29 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Dec 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016