Metcalfe, Ian Leroy (CPSO#: 54621)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Nov 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 1985

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Main Medical
700 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8M 1K7
Phone: (905) 545-1376
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

248 Argyle Street South
Caledonia ON  N3W 1K7
Canada
Phone: (289) 757-2289
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN LEROY METCALFE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. METCALFE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1985
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 04 Sep 2007
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 04 Nov 2007

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 18 Jun 2007
Summary:

 On June 18, 2007, the Discipline  Committee found Dr. Metcalfe to have committed professional 
 misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice of medicine 
 that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
 disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  The Discipline Committee ordered the following:

 
 
1	The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Metcalfe(s certificate of 
 registration for a period of three (3) months, one (1) month of which shall be suspended if Dr. 
 Metcalfe successfully completes, at his own expense, the College(s Ethics Course and provides 
 proof thereof to the College, to be completed by December 31, 2007. 

 2	The Discipline Committee 
 orders Dr. Metcalfe to pay to the College costs in the amount of $2,500.00. 

 3.	The Discipline 
 Committee directs Dr. Metcalfe to appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
 
4.	The Discipline 
 Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 18, 2007