Mete, Ozgur (CPSO#: 90155)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Jan 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Turkish

Education:Istanbul University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Dept of Laboratory Medicine and
Pathobiology 11th Fl Eaton Wing
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3004
Fax: (416) 340-5517
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Laboratory Medicine Effective: 11 Jan 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 10 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 09 Mar 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 10 Mar 2009 to 31 Jan 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 10 Jan 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 10 Jan 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jul 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jul 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Ozgur Mete may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Laboratory  Medicine  and  Pathobiology,  University of Toronto, in
                        which  Dr.  Mete  holds  an academic appointment  at  the  rank  of
                        Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  when Dr. Mete no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.