Metser, Ur (CPSO#: 76563)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 08 Sep 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Technion-Israel Institute of Technology, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
610 University Avenue Room 3 960
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 4394
Fax: (416) 946-6564
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. Ur Metser Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Metser ( CPSO# 76563 )

Business Address:
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
610 University Avenue
Room 3-960
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Aug 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 02 Sep 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Mar 2013 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Ur Metser may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
                        Imaging,  University  of  Toronto,  in  which  Dr.  Metser holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirement of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate will automatically expire when Dr. Metser no longer holds
                  the appointment, referred to in clause 1.