Meunier, Bethann Dale (CPSO#: 69169)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Fax: (613) 548-1375
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BETHANN DALE MEUNIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEUNIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 13 Feb 2006 to 31 May 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1997