Mewa, Fatema (CPSO#: 103933)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Department of Medicine
200 Elizabeth Street
Eaton Building 14-217
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3155
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amirudin A. Mewa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Mewa ( CPSO# 103933)
Dr. S. Mewa ( CPSO# 106758)
Dr. A. Mewa ( CPSO# 33022 )

Business Address:
504 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 964-9214

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FATEMA MEWA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MEWA is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. MEWA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MEWA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MEWA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MEWA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MEWA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018