Meyer, Dietmar Manfred (CPSO#: 24308)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 May 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 May 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001