Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Meyer, Sabena Shueh-Er (CPSO#: 68988)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: Yu, Sabena Shueh-Er (used until: 20 Jul 1998 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000