Meyers, Kimberly Lois (CPSO#: 61053)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Sep 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Emo Clinic
PO Box 569
Emo ON  P0W 1E0
Phone: (807) 482-2323 Ext. 5660
Fax: (807) 482-3089
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kimberly Meyers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Meyers ( CPSO# 61053 )

Business Address:
Emo Clinic
260 Front Street
PO Box 569
Emo ON  P0W 1E0
Phone Number: (807) 274-3266

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Emo Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Emo

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLY LOIS MEYERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEYERS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1991