Meyerson, Jeffrey (CPSO#: 51197)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients who require a copy of their medical record may mail their signed, written request to: Dr. Jeffrey Meyerson c/o The Hamilton Academy of Medicine, 1 Young Street, Suite 206, Hamilton ON, or call the Hamilton Academy of Medicine for further assistance at 905-528-1611.
Date Received: 02 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 09 Sep 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2015