Mia, Haroon (CPSO#: 104716)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

South Africa

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 05 Aug 2014 to 29 Sep 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 30 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016