Mian, Mamta (CPSO#: 66890)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: Patel, Mamta Manubhai (used until: 25 Jun 1996 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:Dalhousie University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 17 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 2004