Michael, Essam Samy Naguib (CPSO#: 65577)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1994

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210
12295 Highway 50
Bolton ON  L7E 1M2
Phone: (905) 857-1988
Fax: (905)949 6908
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

220 Dundas street East
suite 3
Belleville ON  K8N 1E2
Canada
Phone: 613 962 7999
Fax: 613 967 1990
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Astra Fertility Clinic
300 Main St
Brampton ON  L6V 1P6
Canada
Phone: (905) 451-4333
Fax: (905) 451-4324
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Astra Fertility Clinic
4303 Village Centre Drive
Unit 15
Mississauga ON  L4Z 1S2
Canada
Phone: (905) 949-6999 Ext. 222
Fax: (905) 949-6908
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

400 Bronte street, unit 105
milton
Milton ON  L9T 0H7
Canada
Phone: (905) 693-1193
Fax: (905) 693-1550
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Essam Michael Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Michael ( CPSO# 65577 )

Business Address:
210 - 12295 Highway 50
Bolton ON  L7E 1H2

Business Address:
4303 Village Court Centre
Mississauga ON  L4Z 1S2
Phone Number: (905) 949-6999

Business Address:
300 Main Street North
Brampton ON  L6V 4H6
Phone Number: (905) 451-4333

Business Address:
105 - 400 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 0H7
Phone Number: (905) 693-1193

Business Address:
220 Dundas Street East
Suite 210
Belleville ON  K8N 1E2
Phone Number: (613) 962-7999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ESSAM SAMY NAGUIB MICHAEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MICHAEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 30, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective May 29, 2015, where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.

The following are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

It is alleged that Essam Michael between January 1, 2007 and May 21, 2013 at the City of Mississauga, and elsewhere in Ontario did by deceit, falsehood or other fraudulent means defraud The Ministry of Health and Long Term Care of a sum exceeding $5000 by billing for services not rendered contrary to section 380(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of charges: August 30, 2016
Place of charges: Brampton, ON
Ontario Provincial Police