Michael, George Phillip (CPSO#: 69627)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Yonge Davis Centre
C 2 B
17480 Yonge Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8A7
Phone: (905) 898-3700
Fax: (905) 898-3738
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. George P. Michael Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Michael ( CPSO# 69627 )

Business Address:
St. George Medcare Clinic
Suite C2B
17480 Yonge Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8A7
Phone Number: (905) 898-3700

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE PHILLIP MICHAEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MICHAEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 06 Sep 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 07 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Nov 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2000