Michailidis, Michael (CPSO#: 69199)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jan 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Michailidis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Michailidis ( CPSO# 69199 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Dec 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL MICHAILIDIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MICHAILIDIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2001