Michalchuk, Andre Stephen (CPSO#: 58602)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1403 29 Street NW
Calgary AB  T2N 2T9
Phone: (403) 944-1820

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDRE STEPHEN MICHALCHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MICHALCHUK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Sep 1988 to 10 Oct 1988
Other - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1988