Michalska, Irena Krystyna (CPSO#: 26161)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish, Russian

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 23 Apr 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1973
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 27 Nov 2000
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 03 Aug 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011