Michalski, Kathleen Anne (CPSO#: 59735)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201A
119 Memorial Ave.
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone: (705) 325-0630
Fax: (705) 325-9498
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Michalski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Michalski ( CPSO# 59735 )

Business Address:
Suite 201A
119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone Number: (705) 325-0630

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHLEEN ANNE MICHALSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MICHALSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1989