Michaud, Gaetane Celine (CPSO#: 72070)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 25 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 10 Feb 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 09 Feb 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 10 Feb 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 09 Feb 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 10 Feb 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 09 Feb 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Feb 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jul 2005