Michaud, Jean (CPSO#: 44064)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2630
Fax: (613) 738-4837
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

TheOttawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Box 115
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8294
Fax: (613) 737-8712
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 29 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEAN MICHAUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MICHAUD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1998