Michell, Marcus Jonathan (CPSO#: 51198)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
114 Maitland St.
Toronto ON  M4Y 1E1
Phone: (416) 934-7894
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 05 Sep 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARCUS JONATHAN MICHELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MICHELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 25 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1986