Michiels, John Francis (CPSO#: 55373)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
206 John Street
Dunnville ON  N1A 2P7
Phone: (905) 774-7431
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J.F. Michiels Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Michiels ( CPSO# 55373 )

Business Address:
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
206 John Street
Dunnville ON  N1A 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 774-7431

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN FRANCIS MICHIELS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MICHIELS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2014