Mickelson, Roy Ross (CPSO#: 56332)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Sep 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Jun 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2197 Riverside Drive
Suite 506
Ottawa ON  K1H 7X3
Phone: (613) 523-0108
Fax: (613) 523-0108
Electoral District: 07

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 16 Apr 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 16 Apr 2018 Active View Details [+]
            [1 of 2 Undertakings]

            As from April 16, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Roy Ross Mickelson,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Mickelson to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. ROY ROSS MICKELSON
                                          ("Dr. Mickelson")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Mickelson, certificate of registration number 56332, am a member
                  of the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Mickelson, acknowledge that following an investigation that raised
                  concerns about my standard of practice, I underwent remediation and
                  submitted to a reassessment of my practice. The reassessment report
                  subsequently received by the College raised concerns about my standard of
                  practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Mickelson, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not replace the
                  undertaking I made to the College on June 11, 2014 (the "2014
                  Undertaking"). I further acknowledge that the practice restriction to
                  which I agreed in the 2014 Undertaking (that I not engage in and/or
                  perform intravenous chelation) continues to be in effect. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Mickelson, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.

            (6)   Resignation

                  (a)   I, Dr. Mickelson, hereby resign from the College effective June 1,
                        2018 (the "Resignation Date").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Mickelson, hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for
                        registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any
                        other jurisdiction after my Resignation Date.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Mickelson, acknowledge that in the event that the College
                        should become aware that I am in breach of this Undertaking
                        including, but not limited to, becoming aware that I have either
                        applied, re-applied or attempted to apply or re-apply for
                        registration as a physician or for a certificate of registration,
                        or equivalent, to practise medicine in any jurisdiction after my
                        Resignation Date, the College shall, in its sole discretion, have
                        the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of
                        a breach of this Undertaking and shall have the right to proceed
                        with the Investigation it terminated as a result of this
                        Undertaking and/or to proceed with a referral of specified
                        allegations to the Discipline Committee.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Mickelson, hereby agree to bear the risk of any prejudice
                        that the passage of time might cause to my ability to make full
                        answer and defence, and waive the right to seek any remedy on the
                        basis of the passage of time, should the College proceed with any
                        allegations that may arise as a result of a breach of this
                        Undertaking and/or pursuant to section (6)(c) above.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Mickelson, undertake to abide by the College's Policy on
                        Practice Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to
                        Practise, Take an Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice
                        Due to Relocation, a copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix
                        "A".
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Mickelson, undertake that upon signing this Undertaking, I
                        shall forward a request to the General Manager of OHIP that my
                        billing number be deactivated for services rendered after my
                        Resignation Date.
                  
            (7)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Mickelson, undertake that I will not prescribe, recommend or
                        make use of any oral chelation agents in respect of patients.
                  
            (8)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Mickelson, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), until my Resignation Date ("Clinical
                        Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Mickelson, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "B", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss practice improvement
                              recommendations;
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every month;
                  
                        (iii) Review at least twenty (20) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vii) Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Mickelson, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the areas of
                        concern identified in the reports of the assessor dated November
                        21, 2016 and April 18, 2017, and concerns that may arise during the
                        period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Mickelson, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "B" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Mickelson, undertake to ensure that Appendix "B" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Mickelson, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "B" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Mickelson, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a
                        Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (8)(e)
                        and/or (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time
                        as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Mickelson, acknowledge that if I am required to cease
                        practise as a result of section (8)(g) above this will constitute a
                        term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and
                        that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (9)   Professional Education

                  (a)   I, Dr. Mickelson, acknowledge that I successfully completed the
                        University of Toronto, Faculty of Medicine's course Medical Record
                        Keeping on March 6, 2017 and provided proof of my successful
                        completion of the course to the College.
                  
            (10)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Mickelson, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Mickelson, undertake that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Mickelson, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                        make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Mickelson, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (11)  I, Dr. Mickelson, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Mickelson, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (13)  I, Dr. Mickelson, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (14)  I, Dr. Mickelson, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (15)  I, Dr. Mickelson, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (16)  I, Dr. Mickelson, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (17)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Mickelson, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Mickelson, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (17)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              The College commenced an investigation that raised concerns
                              about Dr. Mickelson's standard of practice. Following this
                              investigation, Dr. Mickelson underwent remediation and
                              submitted to a practice reassessment. The reassessment raised
                              concerns about Dr. Mickelson's standard of practice. While
                              the reassessment process was ongoing, Dr. Mickelson retired
                              from the practice of medicine. Accordingly:
                  
                                    *     Dr. Mickelson will resign from the College,
                                          effective June 1, 2018 and has agreed never to
                                          apply or reapply for registration as a physician
                                          in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
                                    *     Dr. Mickelson will practise under the guidance of
                                          a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College
                                          until his resignation. 
                                    *     Dr. Mickelson must not prescribe, recommend or
                                          make use of any oral chelation agents in respect
                                          of patients.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (18)  I, Dr. Mickelson, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (19)  I, Dr. Mickelson, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to
                  the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (20)  I, Dr. Mickelson, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "B" to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which they reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm
                        to my patients.
                  
                  
            [2 of 2]
            As from June 11, 2014, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Roy Ross Mickelson,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Mickelson to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Mickelson may not engage in and/or perform intravenous chelation.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 16, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Roy Ross Mickelson to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 16, 2018:

The College commenced an investigation that raised concerns about Dr. Mickelson's standard of practice. Following this investigation, Dr. Mickelson underwent remediation and submitted to a practice reassessment. The reassessment raised concerns about Dr. Mickelson's standard of practice. While the reassessment process was ongoing, Dr. Mickelson retired from the practice of medicine. Accordingly:

-Dr. Mickelson will resign from the College, effective June 1, 2018 and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
-Dr. Mickelson will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College until his resignation.
-Dr. Mickelson must not prescribe, recommend or make use of any oral chelation agents in respect of patients.