Mickle, Donald Alexander Gordon (CPSO#: 21379)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1968

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 Feb 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 11
10035 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Z 0E6
Phone: (905) 453-2441
Fax: (905) 453-4624
Electoral District: 05

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 13 Oct 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Biochemistry Effective: 02 Apr 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1968
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2009
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 29 Nov 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 29 Nov 2009 Active View Details [+]
            As from November 29, 2009, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Donald Alexander Gordon
            Mickle, in accordance with an undertaking and consent provided to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario by Dr. Mickle:

            (i)   Dr. Donald Mickle has ceased to practise medicine as a primary care
                  physician and limits his practice of medicine to providing services in
                  walk-in clinic settings only; 

            (ii)  Dr. Donald Mickle has engaged a clinical supervisor who is acceptable to
                  the College to meet with him to review a minimum number of patient
                  records each visit and discuss any issues or concerns arising therefrom.