Microys, Gisele Ilse (CPSO#: 19482)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1972 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Mar 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 1996