Middlebrook, Shelia Marlene (CPSO#: 70273)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Second Floor
501 Plains Road East
Burlington ON  L7T 2E2
Phone: (905) 635-7313
Fax: (905) 681-9404
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHELIA MARLENE MIDDLEBROOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIDDLEBROOK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1999