Middleton, Claire (CPSO#: 67019)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Anaesthesia, UHN
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 5164
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CAMH
1001 Queen st, W
Toronto ON  M6J1H4
Canada
Phone: 4165358501
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 12 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLAIRE MIDDLETON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIDDLETON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 May 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1997