Middleton, James Charles (CPSO#: 29298)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Middleton & Cannon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 30 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Thunder Bay Regional Hospital 980 Oliver Road Thunder Bay, ON P7B 6V4
Date Received: 26 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 16 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014