Middleton, William James (CPSO#: 62128)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5118
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM JAMES MIDDLETON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIDDLETON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1991