Midha, Rajiv (CPSO#: 58130)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 01 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 May 2005