Mielke, Cornelia Ingrid (CPSO#: 55349)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
801 Mohawk Road West
Hamilton ON  L9C 6C2
Phone: (905) 388-2447
Fax: (905) 387-3965
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C.I. Mielke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Mielke ( CPSO# 55349 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
801 Mohawk Road West
Hamilton ON  L9C 6C2
Phone Number: (905) 388-2447

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CORNELIA INGRID MIELKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIELKE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1989