Mihic, Annette Mary Christine (CPSO#: 55263)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English, French, German, Italian

Education:National University of Ireland, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: The Hamilton Academy of Medicine Suite 206 1 Young Street Hamilton, Ontario L8N 1T8 Telephone: (905) 528-1611
Date Received: 24 May 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 17 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012