Mihok, Marika Linn (CPSO#: 90944)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: Armstrong, Marika Linn (used until: 01 Aug 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway-Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1130 Morrison Drive, Suite 120
Ottawa ON  K2H 9N6
Canada
Phone: (613) 820-5050
Fax: (613) 820-7831
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marika Mihok Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mihok ( CPSO# 90944 )

Business Address:
JDC Medical Clinic
1130 Morrison Drive
Ottawa ON  K2H 9N6

Business Address:
Queensway-Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 29 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIKA LINN MIHOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIHOK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2011 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2013