Mihu, Elena (CPSO#: 68921)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian, Romanian

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
31 County Road 503
P O Box 118
Kinmount ON  K0M 2A0
Phone: (705) 488-1105
Fax: (705) 488-1119
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELENA MIHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1997