Mijavec, Borislava (CPSO#: 81487)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Feb 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Feb 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bosnian, Croatian, English, Serbian, Slovak

Education:University of Novi Sad, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
210 Centrum Boulevard
Orleans ON  K1E 3V7
Phone: (613) 834-0814
Fax: (613) 830-2260
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BORISLAVA MIJAVEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIJAVEC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 04 Jul 2004 to 30 Jul 2004
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 03 Aug 2004 to 03 Sep 2004
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2006