Mikhael, Joseph Riad (CPSO#: 71328)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 20 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 2008