Mikhail, Pierre George William (CPSO#: 69198)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Huntsville District
Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Phone: (705) 789-2311
Fax: (705) 789-6216
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pierre Mikhail Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mikhail ( CPSO# 69198 )

Business Address:
Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Phone Number: (705) 789-2311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PIERRE GEORGE WILLIAM MIKHAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIKHAIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1997