Mikhail, Roland Girgis (CPSO#: 71763)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Mar 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2464 Howard Ave
Suite 201
Windsor, Ontario
N8X3V6
Windsor ON  N8X 1J9
Phone: (519) 977-6643
Fax: (519) 915-6326
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roland Mikhail Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mikhail ( CPSO# 71763 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 977-6643

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4444

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROLAND GIRGIS MIKHAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIKHAIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2010