Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: October 22, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On October 22, 2021, the Children’s Hospital of Eastern Ontario (CHEO) notified the College, pursuant to the Public Hospitals Act and the Regulated Health Professions Act (Schedule 2, the Health Professions Procedural Code), that Dr. Matyas’ privileges at CHEO were suspended for failure to comply with hospital policy.
On April 1, 2023, CHEO notified the College pursuant to the Public Hospitals Act and the Regulated Health Professions Act that CHEO denied Dr. Matyas’ application to renew his hospital privileges for 2022-23 for continued failure to comply with hospital privileges, and that Dr. Matyas no longer holds privileges at CHEO.
Source: Hospital
Active Date: October 18, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On October 18, 2021, Queensway Carleton Hospital notified the College, pursuant to section 33 of the Public Hospitals Act, that the privileges of Dr. Miklos Matyas at Queensway Carleton Hospital have been temporarily suspended due to failure to comply with hospital policy.
On March 10, 2022, and confirmed April 1, 2022, Queensway Carleton Hospital notified the College, pursuant to the Public Hospitals Act, that Dr. Matyas’ application for renewal of privileges at the hospital was denied for April 1, 2022 until March 31, 2023 for failure to comply with hospital policy.
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: February 27, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
(1 of 3)
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.
Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: February 27, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
(2 of 3)
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.
Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: February 27, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
(3 of 3)
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.
Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)