Mikulis, David John (CPSO#: 65012)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tufts University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 5612
Fax: (416) 603-4257
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 10 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN MIKULIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIKULIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 May 1992
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 May 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 May 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1993