Miladinovic, Ljiljana (CPSO#: 77299)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bosnian, Croatian, English, Serbian

Education:University of Belgrade, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rosedale Medical Center
Suite 405
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone: (416) 929-2173
Fax: (416) 929-4906
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ljiljana Miladinovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Miladinovic ( CPSO# 77299 )

Business Address:
Suite 405
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone Number: (416) 929-2173

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LJILJANA MILADINOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILADINOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Feb 2002 to 20 Feb 2002
Elective Trainee - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 20 Feb 2002 to 05 Mar 2002
Elective Trainee - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 06 Mar 2002 to 03 Apr 2002
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 03 Apr 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2002